AZ SB1085 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Association health plans; definitions; requirements
Title
Association health plans; definitions; requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Chapter 194 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-21-1-0) |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Accountable Health Plans
Association Health Plans
Bona Fide Association
Bona Fide Groups
Definitions
Insurance - Title 20
Strike Everything Amendment
Association Health Plans
Bona Fide Association
Bona Fide Groups
Definitions
Insurance - Title 20
Strike Everything Amendment