AZ SB1083 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Agriculture department; livestock loss board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture department; livestock loss board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-26 Transmitted to Governor
2020-05-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-05-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (52-8-0-0)
2020-05-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-05-21HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-05-21HouseHouse LAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-03-03HouseHouse read second time
2020-03-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-03-02HouseAssigned to House LAG Committee
2020-03-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-02-12HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2020-02-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-02-06SenateSenate WAG Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2020-01-14SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-13SenateAssigned to Senate WAG Committee
2020-01-13SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-01-08SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32413Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72691
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1083p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1083s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.10830843.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/s.10830400.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1083wag.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1083allen s0814.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72691&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72691&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72691&billStatusActionId=193333&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72691&billStatusActionId=193335&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72691&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72691&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72691&billStatusActionId=196328&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72691&billStatusActionId=196340&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback