AZ SB1072 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter 15
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Early voting centers; identification required

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early voting centers; identification required

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateChapter 15
2019-03-22SenateGovernor Signed
2019-03-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-03-18SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-18HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0)
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-11HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-03-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-05HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-14HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-14SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2019-02-13SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2019-01-29SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-29SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-01-28SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-01-28SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-24SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2019-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
16411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16542Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71189
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1072p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1072s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0015.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1072ugenti-rita0800.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71189&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71189&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71189&billStatusActionId=185983&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71189&billStatusActionId=186323&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71189&billStatusActionId=186495&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71189&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71189&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71189&billStatusActionId=188372&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71189&billStatusActionId=188418&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback