AZ SB1069 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Permanent early voting list; eligibility
Title
Permanent early voting list; eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
County Recorder
Early Voting
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Eligibility
Notification
Permanent Early Voting Lists
Early Voting
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Eligibility
Notification
Permanent Early Voting Lists