AZ SB1069 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Chapter 57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Postsecondary institutions; free expression policies
Title
Postsecondary institutions; free expression policies
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chapter 57 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Education - Title 15
Free Expression
Policies
Postsecondary Institutions
Strike Everything Amendment
Students' Right To Speech
Free Expression
Policies
Postsecondary Institutions
Strike Everything Amendment
Students' Right To Speech
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 346 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |