AZ SB1064 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Court security officers; certification; powers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court security officers; certification; powers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-11SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-02-05SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-05SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-04SenateSenate consent calendar
2019-02-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-01-28SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2019-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-16SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2019-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback