AZ SB1063 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Chapter 48
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Produce safety rule; state administration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Produce safety rule; state administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateChapter 48
2018-03-23SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-20SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-19SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-03-19HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2018-03-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-03-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-03-08HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2018-02-19HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-02-05HouseTransmit to House
2018-02-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-01-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-01-11SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2018-01-10SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-01-05SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3413Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3415Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
3483New CodeSee Bill Text
3484Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3485Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3486Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3487Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3488Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3489Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3490Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3492Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3494Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3496Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3497Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3498Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3527.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3527.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49221Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69769
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1063p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/sb1063s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0048.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.1063floorgriffin.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69769&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69769&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69769&billStatusActionId=180056&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69769&billStatusActionId=180086&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69769&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69769&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69769&billStatusActionId=182540&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback