AZ SB1063 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Obstructing a highway; public thoroughfare
Title
Obstructing a highway; public thoroughfare
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Military and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Chapter 137 | |
2015-04-01 | Governor Signed | |
2015-03-26 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-24 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-24-3-0) |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2015-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-8-1-0) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Senate PSMT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-1-0) |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PSMT Committee |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |