AZ SB1049 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reviser's technical corrections; 2024
Title
Reviser's technical corrections; 2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DP/C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (DP/C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (DP/PFC) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Chapter 105 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-04-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-0-10-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: DP/C&P, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-14 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Do pass and proper for consideration, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
2024
Disclosure Affidavit
Land Divisions
Legislative Dispositions Of Statutory Text
Property - Title 33
Property Leased To Educational Institutions
Purpose
Recording
Repeal
Retroactivity
Reviser's Technical Corrections
Disclosure Affidavit
Land Divisions
Legislative Dispositions Of Statutory Text
Property - Title 33
Property Leased To Educational Institutions
Purpose
Recording
Repeal
Retroactivity
Reviser's Technical Corrections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 422 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 11132 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |