AZ SB1041 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Travel insurance
Title
Travel insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Chapter 62 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-05-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-8-0-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-1-0) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Applicability
Definitions
Insurance
Insurance - Title 20
Insurance Coverage
Purpose
Travel Insurance
Travel Insurance Model Act
Travel Protection Plan
Definitions
Insurance
Insurance - Title 20
Insurance Coverage
Purpose
Travel Insurance
Travel Insurance Model Act
Travel Protection Plan
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 3503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 3504 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 3505 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 3506 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 3507 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 3508 | New Code | See Bill Text |