AZ SB1035 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; building codes
Title
Technical correction; building codes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |