AZ SB1021 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commission for postsecondary education; continuation
Title
Commission for postsecondary education; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 13 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-04 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Commission For Postsecondary Education
Continuation
Education - Title 15
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
Continuation
Education - Title 15
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1852 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1853 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3019.01 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3027.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |