AZ SB1021 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Municipal service access cards; requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal service access cards; requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2017-02-21SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (13-17-0-0)
2017-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-01-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-23SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-01-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2017-01-10SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-09SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-01-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-01-04SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9500.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68434
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1021p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1021s.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1021kavanagh1129.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68434&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68434&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68434&billStatusActionId=175273&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68434&billStatusActionId=175390&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68434&billStatusActionId=175227&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback