AZ SB1016 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Physicians; naturopathic medicine

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physicians; naturopathic medicine

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2021-01-12SenateSenate read second time
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-01-11SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-01-11SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-12-16SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
122801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
131415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15843Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283167Amended CodeSee Bill Text
283315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
361673Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36663Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36664Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback