AZ SB1006 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate FIN Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Technical correction; tax refund account

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical correction; tax refund account

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-12SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2018-01-09SenateSenate read second time
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-01-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-11-15SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
421117Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback