AZ SB1006 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Assigned to Senate HHS Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Special masters; technical correction
Title
Special masters; technical correction
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-12-07 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68395 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1006p.htm |