AZ HR2004 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on February 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-27 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution; George Rockwell.
Title
Resolution; George Rockwell.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-27 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2012-02-27 | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-13 | House Consent Calendar February 13, 2012 @ 6:21 PM | |
2012-02-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-15 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-06 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2012-01-31 | House read second time | |
2012-01-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced in House and read first time |