AZ HM2002 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Motorcycle profiling; encouraging prevention
Title
Motorcycle profiling; encouraging prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2019-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |