AZ HCR2056 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage; younger workers
Title
Minimum wage; younger workers
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Court [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2012-04-30 | House final reading , voting: (45-15-0-0) | |
2012-04-30 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-25 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-25 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-24 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-24 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2012-04-19 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-04-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-09 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-20 | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (12-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Senate CE Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2012-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House third reading PASSED voting: (39-18-3-0) | |
2012-03-05 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2012-02-06 | House read second time | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced in House and read first time |