AZ HCR2041 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-14)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Girl scouts; centennial
Title
Girl scouts; centennial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2012-03-12 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-12 | Senate third reading UNANIMOUSLY ADOPTED | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to Senate Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-07 | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-3-0) | |
2012-01-30 | House Consent Calendar January 30, 2012 @ 4:00 PM | |
2012-01-31 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-31 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-01-30 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-25 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |