AZ HCR2024 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Senate HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Medical marijuana; mental health; research

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; mental health; research

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-08SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-04SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (44-16-0-0)
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-15HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-2-0-0-0)
2021-02-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-04HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-03HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2021-02-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/75246
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hcr2024p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hcr2024h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484043
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484613
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486502
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/487174
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75246&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75246&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75246&billStatusActionId=201651&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75246&billStatusActionId=202536&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=75246&billStatusActionId=202548&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=75246&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback