AZ HCR2023 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Article V convention; term limits
Title
Article V convention; term limits
Sponsors
Rep. David Stringer [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Rep. Noel Campbell [R] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] |
Rep. Paul Mosley [R] | Rep. Becky Nutt [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-14 | House | House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to House FPRPP Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |