AZ HCR2022 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Balanced budget convention; delegates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Balanced budget convention; delegates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30 Transmitted to Secretary of State
2017-03-30HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-30SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-12-1-0)
2017-03-30SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-03-30HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (34-21-5-0)
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference adopted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference adopted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference caucus date
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference caucus date
2017-03-29SenateSenate Minority report
2017-03-29HouseHouse Minority report
2017-03-29HouseHouse Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the concurrent resolution be further amended.
2017-03-29SenateSenate Conference members: KAVANAGH, LESKO, QUEZADA
2017-03-29SenateSenate Conference appointed
2017-03-29HouseHouse Conference members: MESNARD, BLANC, TOWNSEND
2017-03-29HouseHouse Conference appointed
2017-03-28HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2017-03-28HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2017-03-27HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0)
2017-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-07SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-24-2-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-14HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-08HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2017-02-08HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69407
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hcr2022p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hcr2022h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hcr2022s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hcr2022c.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/hcr2022.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.hcr2022lesko0342.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.hcr2022approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/ccamendments/53leg/1r/h.hcr2022fcc2.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69407&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69407&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69407&billStatusActionId=175389&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69407&billStatusActionId=175316&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69407&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69407&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69407&billStatusActionId=176708&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69407&billStatusActionId=176718&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69407&billStatusActionId=176796&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69407&billStatusActionId=176799&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback