AZ HCR2021 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electoral college; supporting
Title
Electoral college; supporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |