AZ HCR2017 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - House minority caucus: Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Renewable energy standards; corporation commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable energy standards; corporation commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-10HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-05HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-11-2-1)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-03SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-02SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-27SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2018-03-21SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2018-03-21SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-22SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-22SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-08SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (40-18-1-0)
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-30HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70197
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcr2017p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcr2017h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcr2017s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.hcr2017kavanagh.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.hcr2017approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.hcr2017floorkavanagh.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70197&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70197&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70197&billStatusActionId=180571&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70197&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70197&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70197&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70197&billStatusActionId=182996&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70197&billStatusActionId=183033&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback