AZ HCR2016 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-28 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-28 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Initiatives; supermajority vote requirement
Title
Initiatives; supermajority vote requirement
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] |
Rep. Travis Grantham [R] | Sen. Jake Hoffman [R] | Rep. Becky Nutt [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Rep. Bret Roberts [R] | Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2021-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-04 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Concurrent Resolution
Constitution Of Arizona
Initiative And Referendum
Initiatives
Supermajority Requirement
Vote
Constitution Of Arizona
Initiative And Referendum
Initiatives
Supermajority Requirement
Vote