AZ HCR2016 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Personal property tax; exemption
Title
Personal property tax; exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-1-0) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-20-4-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-4-0-2-0) |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2015-02-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |