AZ HCR2014 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
United States; Taiwan; partnership.
Title
United States; Taiwan; partnership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2021-03-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (0-0-0-) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-8-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |