AZ HCR2010 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Application; Article V convention
Title
Application; Article V convention
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] | Sen. Anthony Kern [R] | Rep. Noel Campbell [R] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] |
Sen. Warren Petersen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |