AZ HCR2007 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Clean elections; unlawful contributions; rulemaking

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean elections; unlawful contributions; rulemaking

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04 Transmitted to Secretary of State
2018-05-04HouseHouse concurs
2018-05-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-05-04HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-05-04HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (33-24-3-0)
2018-05-03HouseTransmit to House
2018-05-03SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-26SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-22SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2018-02-27SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-26SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-21SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-20HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0)
2018-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-08HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2018-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-18HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2018-01-18HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69902
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcr2007p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcr2007h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hcr2007s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/hcr2007.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/h.hcr2007coleman.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/h.hcr2007government.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.hcr2007petersen0422.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.hcr2007yee0832.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69902&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69902&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69902&billStatusActionId=181266&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69902&billStatusActionId=181336&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69902&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69902&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69902&billStatusActionId=183733&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69902&billStatusActionId=183773&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69902&billStatusActionId=183792&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69902&billStatusActionId=183817&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69902&billStatusActionId=183819&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback