AZ HCR2006 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Four-year terms; legislature.
Title
Four-year terms; legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | House third reading None voting: (33-22-5-0) |
2018-03-05 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-20 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (25-34-1-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-01 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |