AZ HCR2005 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Initiative; referendum; signatures; legislative districts
Title
Initiative; referendum; signatures; legislative districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-01-11 | House | Prefile |