AZ HCR2002 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Repeal 1998 proposition 105

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal 1998 proposition 105

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-25-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-30HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-26HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2017-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2017-01-05HousePrefile

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback