AZ HCR2001 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Navajo Generating Station
Title
Navajo Generating Station
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Federal Relations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House FR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-18 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Assigned to House FR Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefile |