AZ HCM2003 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Transmitted to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Colorado river; urging augmentation
Title
Colorado river; urging augmentation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Transmitted to Secretary of State | |
2021-04-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (43-17-0-0) |
2021-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Colorado River
Concurrent Memorial
Conservation
United States Department Of Interior
Urging Augmentation
Concurrent Memorial
Conservation
United States Department Of Interior
Urging Augmentation