AZ HB2921 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1831
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2921 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2921 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption; original birth certificate; release
Title
Adoption; original birth certificate; release
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2921 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2921 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1831 (Replaced by) 2021-06-29 - Chapter 384
Subjects
Adoption
Appropriations
Birth Certificates
Child Safety - Title 8
Confidentiality
Consent
Fathers' Rights
Notification
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Release
Waiver
Appropriations
Birth Certificates
Child Safety - Title 8
Confidentiality
Consent
Fathers' Rights
Notification
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Release
Waiver
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 336 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 337 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 340 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |