AZ HB2913 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1850
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2913 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2913 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reviser's technical corrections; 2021
Title
Reviser's technical corrections; 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2913 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2913 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1850 (Replaced by) 2021-06-30 - Chapter 401
Subjects
2021
Defective And Conflicting
Director Of The Department Of Insurance And Financial Institutions
General Appropriations Act
Insurance - Title 20
Legislative Dispositions
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Qualifying Health Information Exchange Organization
Repeal
Retroactivity
Reviser's Technical Corrections
State Government - Title 41
Statutory Text
Defective And Conflicting
Director Of The Department Of Insurance And Financial Institutions
General Appropriations Act
Insurance - Title 20
Legislative Dispositions
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Qualifying Health Information Exchange Organization
Repeal
Retroactivity
Reviser's Technical Corrections
State Government - Title 41
Statutory Text
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 321.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 3201 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |