AZ HB2910 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1848
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2910 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2910 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency shelter beds; seniors
Title
Emergency shelter beds; seniors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2910 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2910 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1848 (Replaced by) 2021-06-30 - Chapter 399