AZ HB2904 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1832
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2904 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-25 - House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2904 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Restricted license; DUI; suspension
Title
Restricted license; DUI; suspension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - Motion Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2904 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma moved that rules be suspended and House Bill 2904 be immediately placed under the order of business Third Reading of bills for the purpose of substitution of bills on Third Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | House read second time |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1832 (Replaced by) 2021-06-29 - Chapter 385
Subjects
Administrative License Suspension
Alcohol Screening
Breath Test
Classification
Definitions
Driver License Restrictions
Driving
Drug Screening
Dui
Enrollment Limitation
Highways
Homicide
Ignition Interlock Devices
Ignition Interlock Requirement
License
Mandatory Revocation Of License
Permit Restrictions
Prior Convictions
Racing
Reckless Driving
Restricted Licenses
Schools
Surrender
Suspension
Traffic Survival School
Transportation - Title 28
Unlicensed Drivers
Violation
Alcohol Screening
Breath Test
Classification
Definitions
Driver License Restrictions
Driving
Drug Screening
Dui
Enrollment Limitation
Highways
Homicide
Ignition Interlock Devices
Ignition Interlock Requirement
License
Mandatory Revocation Of License
Permit Restrictions
Prior Convictions
Racing
Reckless Driving
Restricted Licenses
Schools
Surrender
Suspension
Traffic Survival School
Transportation - Title 28
Unlicensed Drivers
Violation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1387 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 693 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 708 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |