AZ HB2900 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1828
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Omnibus; taxation.
Title
Omnibus; taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - Motion Rep. Toma motioned that the House rescind its action whereby it failed to pass House Bill 2900 in Committee of the Whole and the bill be placed on the active calendar of Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House - Representative Hoffman show the bill passed as amended and that the Hoffman floor amendment be included (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (FAILED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House - Representative Hoffman show the bill passed as amended and that the Hoffman floor amendment be included (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (FAILED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-06-24 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Rep. Toma motioned that the House rescind its action whereby it failed to pass House Bill 2900 in Committee of the Whole and the bill be placed on the active calendar of Committee of the Whole. Motion passed v/v. |
2021-06-07 | House | House motion to amend |
2021-06-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (30-30-0-0) |
2021-05-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-05-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-05-25 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1828 (Replaced by) 2021-06-30 - Chapter 412
Subjects
Administration
Affordable Housing Tax Credit
Application Deadline
Appropriations
Arizona Department Of Housing
Arizona Empowerment Scholarship Accounts
Benefits
Capital Investment Incentives
Conditional Enactment
Corporations
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Economic Security
Department Of Insurance And Financial Institutions
Department Of Labor
Department Of Revenue
Dependent Tax Credit
Education - Title 15
Exemption
Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Fraud
Gross Income
Healthy Forest Production Tax Credit
Homeowner Property Taxes
Implementation
Insurance
Labor - Title 23
Low-income Scholarships
Notice
Omnibus
Premium Tax
Purpose
Refunds
Renewable Energy Production
Report
Retail Classification
Revenue Sharing Stabilization Fund
Saving Clause
School Tuition Organizations
Special Provisions
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
State Government - Title 41
Students With Disabilities
Tax Rates
Taxation
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Taxes
Urban Revenue Sharing
Wages
Affordable Housing Tax Credit
Application Deadline
Appropriations
Arizona Department Of Housing
Arizona Empowerment Scholarship Accounts
Benefits
Capital Investment Incentives
Conditional Enactment
Corporations
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Economic Security
Department Of Insurance And Financial Institutions
Department Of Labor
Department Of Revenue
Dependent Tax Credit
Education - Title 15
Exemption
Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Fraud
Gross Income
Healthy Forest Production Tax Credit
Homeowner Property Taxes
Implementation
Insurance
Labor - Title 23
Low-income Scholarships
Notice
Omnibus
Premium Tax
Purpose
Refunds
Renewable Energy Production
Report
Retail Classification
Revenue Sharing Stabilization Fund
Saving Clause
School Tuition Organizations
Special Provisions
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
State Government - Title 41
Students With Disabilities
Tax Rates
Taxation
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Taxes
Urban Revenue Sharing
Wages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 15001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1076.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1089.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1162 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 243 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 581 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |