AZ HB2892 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1820
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Capital outlay; appropriations; 2021-2022.
Title
Capital outlay; appropriations; 2021-2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House - Representative Espinoza to include the Espinoza flr amendment (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-06-24 | House | House motion to amend |
2021-05-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-05-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-05-25 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1820 (Replaced by) 2021-06-30 - Chapter 406
Subjects
2021-2022
Airport Planning And Development
Amphitheater Building Construction
Appropriations
Arizona Exposition And State Fair Board
Arizona Game And Fish Department
Arizona Pioneers Home
Arizona State Parks
Arizona State Schools For The Deaf And The Blind
Building Demolition
Capital Improvements
Capital Outlay
Capitol Mall Air Handler Units
Central Plant
Classroom Notification System Replacement
Dams
Dark Sky Discovery Center
Dead Horseranch State Park
Deferred Maintenance
Demolition
Department Of Administration
Department Of Emergency And Military Affairs
Department Of Health Services
Department Of Juvenile Corrections
Department Of Public Safety
Department Of State
Department Of Transportation
Discovery Center Roof Repalacement
Door Replacement
Exemption
Fire Alarm System
Fire And Life Safety
Fire Suppression
Fiscal Year 2020-2021
Flagstaff
Globe
Hatchery Maintenance
Highway Construction Projects
Historic Capitol
Holbrook
Interstate 10
Jccr
Kartchner Caverns State Park
Keams Canyon
Kingman
Lapsing Of Appropriations
Legislative Council
Liquid Brine Tanks
Maintenance Building Replacement
Military Installation Preservation And Enhancement Projects
Park Construction
Pavement Rehabilitation
Prescott Valley
Property Maintenance
Red Rock State Park
Reversion
Review
Roof Replacement
Show Low
State Aviation Fund
State Buildings
State Institutions
Statewide Highway Construction
Taylor Rodeo Arena
Vehicle Fueling
Veterans' Home Facilities
Wellness And Training Center
Wickenburg Maintenance Facilities
Widening
Airport Planning And Development
Amphitheater Building Construction
Appropriations
Arizona Exposition And State Fair Board
Arizona Game And Fish Department
Arizona Pioneers Home
Arizona State Parks
Arizona State Schools For The Deaf And The Blind
Building Demolition
Capital Improvements
Capital Outlay
Capitol Mall Air Handler Units
Central Plant
Classroom Notification System Replacement
Dams
Dark Sky Discovery Center
Dead Horseranch State Park
Deferred Maintenance
Demolition
Department Of Administration
Department Of Emergency And Military Affairs
Department Of Health Services
Department Of Juvenile Corrections
Department Of Public Safety
Department Of State
Department Of Transportation
Discovery Center Roof Repalacement
Door Replacement
Exemption
Fire Alarm System
Fire And Life Safety
Fire Suppression
Fiscal Year 2020-2021
Flagstaff
Globe
Hatchery Maintenance
Highway Construction Projects
Historic Capitol
Holbrook
Interstate 10
Jccr
Kartchner Caverns State Park
Keams Canyon
Kingman
Lapsing Of Appropriations
Legislative Council
Liquid Brine Tanks
Maintenance Building Replacement
Military Installation Preservation And Enhancement Projects
Park Construction
Pavement Rehabilitation
Prescott Valley
Property Maintenance
Red Rock State Park
Reversion
Review
Roof Replacement
Show Low
State Aviation Fund
State Buildings
State Institutions
Statewide Highway Construction
Taylor Rodeo Arena
Vehicle Fueling
Veterans' Home Facilities
Wellness And Training Center
Wickenburg Maintenance Facilities
Widening