AZ HB2891 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1819
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Budget procedures; budget reconciliation; 2021-2022.
Title
Budget procedures; budget reconciliation; 2021-2022.
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House - Representative Degrazia to include the Bolding flr amendment (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - House - Representative Degrazia to include the Degrazia flr amendment (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - House - Representative Degrazia to include the Salman #1 flr amendment (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House - Representative Degrazia to include the Degrazia flr amendment (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - House - Representative Degrazia to include the Salman #1 flr amendment (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-06-24 | House | House motion to amend |
2021-06-24 | House | House motion to amend |
2021-06-24 | House | House motion to amend |
2021-05-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-05-25 | House | House read second time |
2021-05-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-05-25 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-05-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1819 (Replaced by) 2021-06-30 - Chapter 405
Subjects
2021-2022
Administration Account
Agency Designation
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Annual Report
Applicability
Appointed Investment Management
Appropriations
Arizona Commerce Authority
Arizona Game And Fish Department
Arizona Legislative Council
Arizona Regional Sports Authority
Attorney General
Authorization
Board Of Trustees
Budget Procedures
Budget Reconciliation
Budget Stabilization Fund
Committee Review
Conditional Enactment
County Fairs
Covid-19
Declaration Of Disaster
Defense Of State Election Laws
Defined Contribution Plan
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Environmental Quality
Department Of Forestry And Fire Management
Department Of State
Department Of Transportation
Department Of Water Resources
Disability Program
Dispute Resolution
Dog Racing
Effective Date
Elected Officials' Defined Contribution Retirement System
Emergency Transfer
Eodc
Essential Government Services
Exemption
Expenditures
Fees
Fiscal Year 2021-2022
Fund
Governor's Regulatory Review Council
Harness Racing
Independent Trust Fund
Intent
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Lapsing Of Appropriations
Licensing Requirements
Major Events Fund
Management
Membership Duties
Museum Gift Shop
Notice
Participating Projects
Permitting Dashboard
Permitting Timetable
Posting Funding Ratio
Powers And Duties
Project Sponsor
Public Finances - Title 35
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Purpose
Quarterly Reports
Racing
Rental Rates
Repair Fund
Reporting Requirements
Representation
Retirement Benefits
Retirement Plans
Retroactivity
Revolving Fund Uses
Secretary Of State
State And Local Government Coordination
State Budget Procedures
State Capitol Museum
State Debt
State Government - Title 41
State Historic Preservation Office
State Land Department
State Monuments
State Permitting Director
State-owned Buildings
Unduly Burdensome Requests
Unrestricted Federal Monies
Wagering
Administration Account
Agency Designation
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Annual Report
Applicability
Appointed Investment Management
Appropriations
Arizona Commerce Authority
Arizona Game And Fish Department
Arizona Legislative Council
Arizona Regional Sports Authority
Attorney General
Authorization
Board Of Trustees
Budget Procedures
Budget Reconciliation
Budget Stabilization Fund
Committee Review
Conditional Enactment
County Fairs
Covid-19
Declaration Of Disaster
Defense Of State Election Laws
Defined Contribution Plan
Delayed Repeal
Department Of Environmental Quality
Department Of Forestry And Fire Management
Department Of State
Department Of Transportation
Department Of Water Resources
Disability Program
Dispute Resolution
Dog Racing
Effective Date
Elected Officials' Defined Contribution Retirement System
Emergency Transfer
Eodc
Essential Government Services
Exemption
Expenditures
Fees
Fiscal Year 2021-2022
Fund
Governor's Regulatory Review Council
Harness Racing
Independent Trust Fund
Intent
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Lapsing Of Appropriations
Licensing Requirements
Major Events Fund
Management
Membership Duties
Museum Gift Shop
Notice
Participating Projects
Permitting Dashboard
Permitting Timetable
Posting Funding Ratio
Powers And Duties
Project Sponsor
Public Finances - Title 35
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Purpose
Quarterly Reports
Racing
Rental Rates
Repair Fund
Reporting Requirements
Representation
Retirement Benefits
Retirement Plans
Retroactivity
Revolving Fund Uses
Secretary Of State
State And Local Government Coordination
State Budget Procedures
State Capitol Museum
State Debt
State Government - Title 41
State Historic Preservation Office
State Land Department
State Monuments
State Permitting Director
State-owned Buildings
Unduly Burdensome Requests
Unrestricted Federal Monies
Wagering
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 132 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 133 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 138 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 604 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
26 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 787 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 832 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 840.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 848.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 866 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 883 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 121.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1277 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1279.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1306 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1307 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1506.02 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 191.12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 714 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 1318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 576 | New Code | See Bill Text |