AZ HB2881 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Genetic testing; private property
Title
Genetic testing; private property
Sponsors
Rep. Bret Roberts [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] |
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House TECH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to House TECH Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |