AZ HB2875 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - House third reading FAILED voting: (25-35-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Regulation; short-term rentals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulation; short-term rentals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (25-35-0-0)
2020-03-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-27HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-27HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-27HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2020-02-20HouseHouse GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-1-0-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-12HouseAssigned to House GOV Committee
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11269.17Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9500.39Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74170
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2875p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2875h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2875blanc.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2875government.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74170&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74170&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74170&billStatusActionId=195232&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74170&billStatusActionId=195333&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback