AZ HB2841 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-29-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Attorney general; initiation of action

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney general; initiation of action

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (30-29-1-0)
2021-02-24HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-02-18HouseHouse GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-11HouseHouse read second time
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to House GE Committee
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41193Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76042
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2841p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2841h.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484321
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485074
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485768
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76042&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76042&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76042&billStatusActionId=201657&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76042&billStatusActionId=203066&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments 750

feedback