AZ HB2821 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State crime; illegal border crossings.
Title
State crime; illegal border crossings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate MAPS Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-0-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-1-0-0) |
2024-02-14 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Appeal To Supreme Court
Civil Immunity
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Emergency
Illegal Border Crossings
Illegal Entry
Illegal Reentry
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
State Crime
State Government - Title 41
Civil Immunity
Courts And Civil Proceedings - Title 12
Criminal Code - Title 13
Emergency
Illegal Border Crossings
Illegal Entry
Illegal Reentry
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
State Crime
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 827 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 828 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 829 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 830 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1750 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |