AZ HB2817 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 36-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Airport fees prohibited; ride sharing
Title
Airport fees prohibited; ride sharing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-17 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 9551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 9557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |