AZ HB2813 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sports betting; historic racing; revenue
Title
Sports betting; historic racing; revenue
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2020-03-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended on reconsideration, voting: (6-5-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Amusements And Sports - Title 5
Criminal Code - Title 13
Department Of Gaming
Sports Betting
Taxation - Title 42
Criminal Code - Title 13
Department Of Gaming
Sports Betting
Taxation - Title 42
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 119 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
5 | 601.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |