AZ HB2798 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; north-south corridor study
Title
Appropriation; north-south corridor study
Sponsors
Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Noel Campbell [R] | Rep. John Fillmore [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Sen. Kelly Townsend [R] | Sen. David Farnsworth [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |