AZ HB2792 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporation; urbanized areas.
Title
Incorporation; urbanized areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-3-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Supervisors
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Urbanized Areas
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Cities And Towns - Title 9
Urbanized Areas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 101.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |